EP2310762 - INTEGRATED ENERGY SYSTEM FOR WHOLE HOME OR BUILDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Watts, Phillip C. 1863 Duchess Drive Longmont, CO 80501 / US | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Gill, David Alan W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09763508.0 | 10.06.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009US46860 | Priority number, date | US20080060377 | 10.06.2008 Original published format: US 60377 | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009152218 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2310762 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L35/30 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
F24S90/00 (EP,US);
H10N10/13 (EP,US);
H10N10/00 (EP,US);
Y02B10/20 (EP,US);
Y02E10/40 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/16] | F24J2/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES ENERGIESYSTEM FÜR DAS GANZE HEIM ODER GEBÄUDE | [2011/16] | English: | INTEGRATED ENERGY SYSTEM FOR WHOLE HOME OR BUILDING | [2011/16] | French: | SYSTÈME ÉNERGÉTIQUE INTÉGRÉ POUR L ENSEMBLE D UN DOMICILE OU D UN IMMEUBLE | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 29.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 20.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/45] | Divisional application(s) | EP11151742.1 / EP2397790 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005263176 (YAMAGUCHI HIROO [JP], et al); | [XAI]EP1679480 (DENSO CORP [JP], et al); | [XAI]WO2007002891 (BSST LLC [US]); | [XI]EP1811646 (HINO MOTORS LTD [JP]); | [XAI]EP1855328 (BOEING CO [US]) | International search | [Y]US4099381 (RAPPOPORT MARC D); | [Y]US4290273 (MECKLER MILTON); | [Y]US6028263 (KOBAYASHI MASAKAZU [JP], et al); | [Y]US2008041054 (MONTESINOS PHILIPPE [FR]) |