EP2376285 - A LAMINATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acco UK Limited Oxford House Oxford Road Aylesbury Buckinghamshire HP21 8SZ / GB | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADLEY, Samuel James 3 Duberly Close Perry Huntingdon Cambridgeshire PE28 0BP / GB | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/42] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09771765.6 | 10.12.2009 | WO2009GB51680 | Priority number, date | GB20080022638 | 11.12.2008 Original published format: GB 0822638 | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010067115 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2376285 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B32B41/00 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
B32B41/00 (EP,GB,US);
B32B37/0053 (GB);
B32B37/142 (EP,US);
B32B2309/02 (US);
B32B2309/022 (EP,US);
B32B2309/025 (GB);
B32B2309/72 (EP,US);
B32B2310/0825 (EP,US);
B32B37/187 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1741 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LAMINIERVORRICHTUNG | [2011/42] | English: | A LAMINATING DEVICE | [2011/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF LAMINÉ | [2011/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 02.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 24.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5810965 (FWU JASON [TW]); | [I]DE10056068 (ROHRSCHEIDT FRIEDRICH VON [US]); | [I]US2002117266 (HAN YOUNG-BAE [KR]); | [I]US2006162841 (HONG DONG-WON [KR]) |