|
04.12.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2018 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.12.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.02.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.02.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.06.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2011 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
21.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
25 |