Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8883130 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2014 | B2 | US2011250160 | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP67623 | 21.12.2009 | DE102008064198 | 22.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2361078 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2019 | B1 | EP2361078 | 31.08.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP67623 | 21.12.2009 | DE102008064198 | 22.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010072705 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2011 | A3 | WO2010072705 | 01.07.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102008064198 | 22.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102008064198 | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008064198 | 22.12.2008 |