|
23.09.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.07.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.04.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
18.04.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
18.04.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2011 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
36 |