25.09.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] |
24.10.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
11.10.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.10.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.10.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.04.2014 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
15.04.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
15.04.2014 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
11.04.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.02.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.11.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.08.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
12.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.04.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.02.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.10.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.10.2012 |
First examination report |
|
17.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.10.2011 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
28.10.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
30.09.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
18.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] |
15.04.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.04.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] |
28.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|