Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020281947 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016878073 | 19.05.2020 | US201313793393 | 11.03.2013 | WO2009US51664 | 24.07.2009 | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | US201514844998 | 03.09.2015 | US67219011 | 14.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015374722 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313793393 | 11.03.2013 | WO2009US51664 | 24.07.2009 | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | US201514844998 | 03.09.2015 | US67219011 | 14.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014100203 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313793393 | 11.03.2013 | WO2009US51664 | 24.07.2009 | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | US67219011 | 14.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8759328 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2014 | B2 | US2011105444 | 05.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US51664 | 24.07.2009 | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | US67219009 | 24.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6095891B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2017 | B2 | JP2011529081 | 01.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US51664 | 24.07.2009 | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2731382 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2020 | C | CA2731382 | 28.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US51664 | 24.07.2009 | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009273889B | Global Dossier | 31.01.2013 | B2 | AU2009273889 | 28.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US51664 | 24.07.2009 | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2321273 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2014 | B1 | EP2321273 | 30.11.2011 | A4 | EP2321273 | 18.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US51664 | 24.07.2009 | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1116144T | 08.02.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | EP09801055 | 24.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2321273T | 16.02.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US51664 | 24.07.2009 | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2525180T | 18.12.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US51664 | 24.07.2009 | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20150093T | 27.03.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US51664 | 24.07.2009 | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | EP09801055 | 24.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2321273T | 29.05.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US51664 | 24.07.2009 | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | EP09801055 | 24.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2321273T | 31.03.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US51664 | 24.07.2009 | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | EP09801055 | 24.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT201500020B | 05.03.2015 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2009US51664 | 24.07.2009 | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010011906 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6375353B | Global Dossier | 15.08.2018 | B2 | JP2017061545 | 30.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2321273E | 29.12.2014 | E | Priority number | Date | US8322308 | 24.07.2008 |