EP2321273 - ONCE-A-WEEK ADMINISTRATION OF 25-HYDROXY VITAMIN D3 TO SUSTAIN ELEVATED STEADY-STATE PHARMACOKINETIC BLOOD CONCENTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wisconsin Alumni Research Foundation 614 Walnut Street Madison, WI 53705 / US | [2014/47] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Wisconsin Alumni Research Foundation 614 Walnut Street Madison, WI 53705 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELUCA, Hector, F. 1809 Hwy. Bb Deerfield WI 53531 / US | 02 /
PLUM, Lori, A. 6139 Hwy. H. Arena WI 53503 / US | 03 /
CLAGETT-DAME, Margaret 1809 Hwy. Bb Deerfield WI 52531 / US | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2013/37] |
Former [2011/20] | McCluskie, Gail Wilson, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09801055.6 | 24.07.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009US51664 | Priority number, date | US20080083223P | 24.07.2008 Original published format: US 83223 P | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010011906 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2321273 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2321273 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07C401/00 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/593 (EP,US);
A61P3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | EINMAL WÖCHENTLICHE VERABREICHUNG VON 25-HYDROXY-VITAMIN D3 ZUR BEWAHRUNG EINER ERHÖHTEN STABILEN PHARMAKOKINETISCHEN BLUTKONZENTRATION | [2011/20] | English: | ONCE-A-WEEK ADMINISTRATION OF 25-HYDROXY VITAMIN D3 TO SUSTAIN ELEVATED STEADY-STATE PHARMACOKINETIC BLOOD CONCENTRATION | [2011/20] | French: | ADMINISTRATION HEBDOMADAIRE DE 25-HYDROXY VITAMINE D3 POUR MAINTENIR UNE CONCENTRATION SANGUINE À PHARMACOCINÉTIQUE STABLE ÉLEVÉE | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 22.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ISH-SHALOM S ET AL, "SU428: Daily, weekly or monthly protocols to reach the desired serum 25-hydroxyvitamin D concentration for the elderly", JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH; 27TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-FOR-BONE-AND-MINERAL-RESEARCH, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH, NEW YORK, NY, US; NASHVILLE, TN, USA, (20050901), vol. 20, no. 9, Suppl. 1, ISSN 0884-0431, page S288, XP009153422 [X] 1-13 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2003195171 (DAIFOTIS ANASTASIA G [US], et al); | [Y]US2005003004 (VEHRING REINHARD [US], et al); | [Y]US2005101576 (WHITEHOUSE MARTHA J [US], et al); | [Y] - HEANEY ET AL, "25-Hydroxylation of Vitamin D3: Relation to Circulating Vitamin D3 Under Various Input Conditions", AM J CLIN NUTR, (200806), vol. 87, pages 1738 - 1742, XP008143060 | by applicant | US3607888 | - BLUNT JW ET AL., "25-Hydroxycholecalciferol: A biologically active metabolite of vitamin D3", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1968), vol. 7, pages 3317 - 3322 | - JONES G ET AL., "Current understanding of the molecular actions of vitamin D", PHYSIOL. REV., (1998), vol. 78, pages 1193 - 1231 | - GORHAM ED ET AL., "Optimal vitamin D status for colorectal cancer prevention - A quantitative meta analysis", AM,J. PREV. MED., (2007), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 210 - 216 | - GARLAND CF ET AL., "Vitamin D and prevention of breast cancer: Pooled analysis", J. STEROID BIOCHEM, AND MOL. BIOL., (2007), vol. 103, pages 3 - 5 | - LI HJ ET AL., "A prospective study of plasma vitamin D metabolites, vitamin D receptor polymorphisms, and prostate cancer", PLOS MEDICINE, (2007), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 562 - 571 | - MUNGER KL ET AL., "Elevated serum 25-hydroxyvitamin D predicts a decreased risk of MS", MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, (2007), vol. 13, no. 2, page 290 | - LOOKER AC ET AL., "Serum 25-hydroxyvitamin D status of adolescent and adults in two seasonal subpopulations from NHANES III", BONE, (2002), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 771 - 777 | - THACHER TD ET AL., "Nutritional rickets around the world: causes and future directions", ANNALS OF TROPICAL PAEDIATRICS, (2006), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 1 - 16 | - LOOKER AC ET AL., "Serum 25-hydroxyvitamin D and hip fracture risk in older U.S. white adults", J. BONE MIN. RES., (2008), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 143 - 150 | - CHONCHOL M ET AL., "25-Hydroxyvitamin D, insulin resistance, and kidney function in the. Third National Health and Nutrition Examination Survey", KIDNEY INT., (2007), vol. 71, no. 2, pages 134 - 139 |