Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
10.03.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.10.2015 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.10.2015 | First examination report | |
12.08.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.09.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant | |
21.03.2014 | Supplementary search report | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] |
21.03.2014 | Change - classification | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] |
21.03.2014 | Change - classification | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] |
30.08.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.08.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.10.2011 | Change - extension states | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
09.09.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.03.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
25.03.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
18.02.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.02.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.02.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.07.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.03.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.02.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication |