EP2313295 - WINDSHIELD WASHER FLUID HEATER AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lansinger, Jere R. 2077 Cliffside Terrace Camano Island, WA 98282-6358 / US | [2011/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09808698.6 | 18.08.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009US54132 | Priority number, date | US20080089577P | 18.08.2008 Original published format: US 89577 P | US20090541207 | 14.08.2009 Original published format: US 541207 | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010022032 | Date: | 25.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2313295 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/48, F24H1/10 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
B60S1/487 (EP,KR,US);
B60H1/00271 (EP,KR,US);
B60H1/242 (EP,KR,US);
B60S1/023 (EP,KR,US);
B60S1/524 (EP,KR,US);
B60S1/54 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | ERHITZER FÜR EINE SCHEIBENWISCHFLÜSSIGKEIT UND SYSTEM DAFÜR | [2011/17] | English: | WINDSHIELD WASHER FLUID HEATER AND SYSTEM | [2011/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE CHAUFFAGE DU LIQUIDE DE LAVE-VITRE | [2011/17] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 12.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 11.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3493041 (HOURWITZ AVINOAM, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 40; figure - * [Y] 5,6,9,11-14 [I] 3,4,7,10; | [Y]US3887004 (BECK THEODORE A) [Y] 5,6 * column 3, line 51 - column 10, line 46; figure - *; | [A]US4090668 (KOCHENOUR PAUL R) [A] 9,14 * abstract * * column 3, line 16 - column 7, line 23 *; | [Y]GB2009385 (OSTBO K) [Y] 9,11-14 * page 2, line 3 - page 5, line 3; figure - *; | [A]US4821797 (ALLGAEUER HANS [AT], et al) [A] 12* column 2, line 47 - column 6, line 21; figure - *; | [XAI]EP1512924 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0128]; figure - * [A] 4-6 [I] 3,7 | International search | [A]US4090668 (KOCHENOUR PAUL R); | [A]US5509606 (BREITHAUPT HOWARD K [US], et al); | [A]KR970040211 (DAEWOO MOTOR CO., LTD.); | [X]US6032324 (LANSINGER JERE RASK [US]); | [A]JP2001171487 (OMATA HAIKAN YOSETSU KK); | [A]US2004118939 (SHANK DAVID [US], et al) |