22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
21.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] |
07.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
01.07.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
27.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
04.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
22.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
24.07.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
17.07.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.07.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.07.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.04.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.03.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
06.03.2015 |
Change - English title |
published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
06.03.2015 |
Change - French title |
published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
17.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.08.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.07.2014 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.03.2014 |
First examination report |
|
05.03.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.12.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
03.05.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
03.05.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
16.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] |
13.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.07.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] |
24.06.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
24.06.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
08.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.05.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|