Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012295519 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213486592 | 01.06.2012 | US25057008 | 14.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012505758 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US59524 | 05.10.2009 | US25057008 | 14.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2346637 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2015 | B1 | EP2346637 | 05.06.2013 | A4 | EP2346637 | 27.07.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US59524 | 05.10.2009 | US25057008 | 14.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0914030 | 03.11.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US59524 | 05.10.2009 | US25057008 | 14.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102186616B | 03.06.2015 | B | CN102186616 | 14.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US59524 | 05.10.2009 | US25057008 | 14.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010045054 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2010 | A3 | WO2010045054 | 22.04.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US25057008 | 14.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8210779 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2012 | B2 | US2010092257 | 15.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25057008 | 14.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110073515 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US25057008 | 14.10.2008 |