Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011309304 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008306720 | 01.12.2008 | WO2009JP70103 | 30.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015083602 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008306720 | 01.12.2008 | JP2015001730 | 07.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5695314B | Global Dossier | 01.04.2015 | B2 | JP2010155825 | 15.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009271532 | 30.11.2009 | JP2008306720 | 01.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2360162 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008306720 | 01.12.2008 | WO2009JP70103 | 30.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102227437 | 26.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008306720 | 01.12.2008 | WO2009JP70103 | 30.11.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010064601 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008306720 | 01.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110099230 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008306720 | 01.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201035105 | 01.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008306720 | 01.12.2008 |