EP2385769 - RAPIDLY DISSOLVING VITAMIN FORMULATION AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeant Pharmaceuticals Luxembourg S.à.r.l. 208, Val des Bons Malades 2121 Luxembourg / LU | [2013/20] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Valeant International (Barbados) SRL Welches Christ Church BB17154 / BB | ||
Former [2011/46] | For all designated states Fleming and Company, Pharmaceuticals 1733 Gilsinn Lane Fenton, MO 63026 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUTTERER, Angela 1733 Gilsinn Lane Fenton, Missouri 63026 / US | 02 /
YACHECHAK, Suzanne, M. 1733 Gilsinn Lane Fenton, Missouri 63026 / US | [2011/46] | Representative(s) | Cooke, Richard Spencer Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Cooke, Richard Spencer Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
Former [2011/46] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09836849.1 | 15.12.2009 | WO2009US68100 | Priority number, date | US20080122615P | 15.12.2008 Original published format: US 122615 P | [2011/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010077878 | Date: | 08.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2385769 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/30, A61K9/22, A23L1/304, A23L1/00 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/714 (EP,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/07 (EP,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,US);
A61K31/197 (EP,US);
A61K31/315 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K31/375 (EP,US);
A61K31/4188 (EP,US);
A61K31/4415 (EP,US);
A61K31/455 (EP,US);
A61K31/51 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K31/525 (EP,US);
A61K31/555 (EP,US);
A61K31/593 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/197, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4188, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4415, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/455, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/51, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/525, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/714, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/32, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/1588, A23V2250/1592, A23V2250/1608, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/1626, A23V2250/1642, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/7042, A23V2250/7044, A23V2250/7046, A23V2250/7052, A23V2250/7056, A23V2250/706, A23V2250/708, A23V2250/72 (EP,US)
(-) |
Former IPC [2011/46] | A23L1/30, A61K9/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHNELL LÖSLICHE VITAMINFORMULIERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER ANWENDUNG | [2011/46] | English: | RAPIDLY DISSOLVING VITAMIN FORMULATION AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME | [2011/46] | French: | FORMULATION DE VITAMINES SE DISSOLVANT RAPIDEMENT ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI | [2011/46] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 22.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.06.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.07.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0112163 (WARNER CHILCOTT LAB IRELAND LT [US]) [Y] 1-11,13-15 * page 5, line 8 - line 21 * * page 9, line 1 - page 11, line 1 * * page 15, line 27 - page 16, line 13 * * page 25, line 6 - line 10; examples 1-5; claims 1-15,28-31,39 *; | [Y]US2002071864 (KIM HYUN-SOO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-11,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9846215 (CIMA LABS INC [US]) [A] 1-11,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1977734 (ROYAL COLLEGE OF SURGEONS IE [IE]) [A] 1-11,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0139601 (DRUGTECH CORP [US]) [A] 1-11,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0111991 (WARNER CHILCOTT LAB IRELAND LT [US]) [A] 1-11,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007042153 (BAYER CONSUMER CARE AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-11,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO02055061 (PARTICLE AND COATING TECHNOLOG [US], et al) [A] 1-11,13-15 * the whole document * | [A] - AGHA-MOHAMMADI SIAMAK ET AL, "Potential impacts of nutritional deficiency of postbariatric patients on body contouring surgery", PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY : JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLASTIC SURGEONS ; OFFICIAL ORGAN OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PLASTIC SURGEONS ; OFFICIAL ORGAN OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF AESTHETIC PLASTIC SURGERY ; OFFICIAL ORGAN OF THE AM, (20081201), vol. 122, no. 6, doi:10.1097/PRS.0B013E31818D20D6, ISSN 1529-4242, pages 1901 - 1914, XP008170414 [A] 1-11,13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/PRS.0b013e31818d20d6 | International search | [X]US2002071864 (KIM HYUN-SOO [KR], et al) |