|
22.08.2024 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2024 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2024 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2024 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
02.05.2024 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.05.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
02.05.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
02.05.2024 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.05.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2024 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2024 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2024 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
42 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 08 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 09 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 10 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 11 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 12 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 13 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
39 |
|
17.11.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2023 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.11.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
16 |
|
06.11.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
139 |
|
06.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2023 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (proprietor) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.07.2023 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2023 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2023 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
38 |
|
11.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.07.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.07.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.07.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.07.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
16 |
|
11.07.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
13 |
|
11.07.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.07.2023 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2023 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.07.2023 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
32 |
|
25.10.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2022 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.05.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
18.05.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
30.03.2022 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2021 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2021 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.11.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.08.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2017 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2015 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2014 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2014 |
Communication of expected date of establishment of search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2010 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.06.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2010 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.06.2010 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |