14.08.2024 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
01.05.2024 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
08.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
20.11.2023 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
17.11.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
18.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
23.07.2023 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
14.07.2023 |
Opposition filed |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
12.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
05.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
24.03.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
09.09.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] |
03.09.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.09.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.09.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.05.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.03.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.10.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.10.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.08.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.04.2018 |
First examination report |
|
19.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.05.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
17.07.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
10.07.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.12.2014 |
Publication of search report |
published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
19.12.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
19.12.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
08.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.12.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] |