EP2269813 - Press punch for a rotary press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fette Compacting GmbH Grabauer Strasse 24 21493 Schwarzenbek / DE | [2023/51] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Fette GmbH Grabauer Strasse 24 21493 Schwarzenbek / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meissner, Friedrich Maikstrasse 18 21031 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Lüdemann, Stefan Korachstrasse 10a 21031 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Naeve, Jan Am Burgwall 19 23899 Kehrsen / DE | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2022/41] |
Former [2011/01] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10006112.6 | 12.06.2010 | [2011/01] | Priority number, date | DE20091031367 | 02.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009031367 | [2011/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2269813 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2269813 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2269813 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B30B15/06, B30B11/08 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
B30B11/08 (EP,US);
B30B15/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] |
Former [2011/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Pressstempel für eine Rundläuferpresse | [2011/01] | English: | Press punch for a rotary press | [2011/01] | French: | Poinçon de presse pour une presse rotative | [2011/01] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 23.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.07.2023
12.07.2023
ADMISSIBLE Bregenzer, Michael / Reule, Hanspeter Neckarstraße 47 73728 Esslingen / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Neckarstraße 47 73728 Esslingen / DE | [2023/33] | 24.07.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.11.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.08.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2024 | 07.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.10.2022 | CZ | 12.10.2022 | DK | 12.10.2022 | EE | 12.10.2022 | ES | 12.10.2022 | FI | 12.10.2022 | HR | 12.10.2022 | LT | 12.10.2022 | LV | 12.10.2022 | MC | 12.10.2022 | NL | 12.10.2022 | RO | 12.10.2022 | SE | 12.10.2022 | SI | 12.10.2022 | SK | 12.10.2022 | SM | 12.10.2022 | NO | 12.01.2023 | GR | 13.01.2023 | IS | 12.02.2023 | PT | 13.02.2023 | IE | 12.06.2023 | LU | 12.06.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/15] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
LU | 12.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 12.10.2022 | |
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 12.10.2022 | |
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | ES | 12.10.2022 | |
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | ES | 12.10.2022 | |
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 12.10.2022 | |
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 12.10.2022 | |
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 12.10.2022 | |
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 12.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8111860U ; | [I]JPH0584277 (KIKUSUI SEISAKUSHO LTD); | [A]DE19646536 (KORSCH PRESSEN GMBH [DE]); | [PX]EP2111972 (FETTE GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE102007043582 | Opposition | DE8111860U | JPH0584277 | US5699273 | US2007087073 | EP2111972 | DE102008020748 |