Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014212450 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43578109 | 05.05.2009 | US201414183740 | 19.02.2014 | US36338309 | 30.01.2009 | IL0300271 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | US201313734350 | 04.01.2013 | US95351304 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014205623 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43578109 | 05.05.2009 | US201414183688 | 19.02.2014 | US36338309 | 30.01.2009 | IL0300271 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | US201313734350 | 04.01.2013 | US95351304 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8691243 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2014 | B2 | US2013108659 | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43578109 | 05.05.2009 | US36338309 | 30.01.2009 | IL0300271 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | US201313734350 | 04.01.2013 | US95351304 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009252756 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43578109 | 05.05.2009 | US36338309 | 30.01.2009 | IL0300271 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | US95351304 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009148470 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36338309 | 30.01.2009 | IL0300271 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | US95351304 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7504110 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2009 | B2 | US2005196415 | 08.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0300271 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | US95351304 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2275128 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2013 | B1 | EP2275128 | 06.04.2011 | A3 | EP2275128 | 19.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03745390 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2275126 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2011 | A3 | EP2275126 | 19.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03745390 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2275125 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2011 | A3 | EP2275125 | 19.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03745390 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2275124 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2011 | A3 | EP2275124 | 19.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03745390 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2275123 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2012 | B1 | EP2275123 | 18.05.2011 | A3 | EP2275123 | 19.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03745390 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2275122 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2011 | A3 | EP2275122 | 19.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03745390 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2275121 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2013 | B1 | EP2275121 | 13.04.2011 | A3 | EP2275121 | 19.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03745390 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2275120 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2011 | A3 | EP2275120 | 19.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03745390 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1490104 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2012 | B1 | EP1490104 | 08.02.2006 | A4 | EP1490104 | 29.12.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IL0300271 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003242955B | Global Dossier | 09.04.2009 | B2 | AU2003242955 | 13.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0300271 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2275127 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2012 | B1 | EP2275127 | 23.03.2011 | A3 | EP2275127 | 19.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03745390 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2481107 | 09.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL0300271 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL164242 | 31.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | IL0300271 | 01.04.2003 | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | IL16424204 | 23.09.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03082183 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2004 | A3 | WO03082183 | 09.10.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US36898102 | 02.04.2002 | Type | Earlier application | EP1490104 |