EP2275127 - Protein-based streptococcus pneumoniae vaccines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ben Gurion University Of The Negev Research And Development Authority P. O. Box 653 84105 Beer Sheva / IL | [2011/14] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Ben Gurion University Of The Negev Research And Development Authority P.O. BOX 653 84106 Beer Sheva / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizrachi Nebenzahl, Yaffa Aharon Katzir Street 24 84836 Beer-Sheva / IL | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Wachenfeld, Joachim Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Wachenfeld, Joachim Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/03] | Wachenfeld, Joachim Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10011327.3 | 01.04.2003 | [2011/03] | Priority number, date | US20020368981P | 02.04.2002 Original published format: US 368981 P | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2275127 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2275127 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2275127 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/09, A61K39/00, A61K39/385, A61K39/02, C07K1/00 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
A61K39/092 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
Y10S530/825 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | Streptococcus-pneumoniae-Vakzine auf Proteinbasis | [2011/03] | English: | Protein-based streptococcus pneumoniae vaccines | [2011/03] | French: | Vaccins contre le streptococcus pneumoniae à base de protéine | [2011/03] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 23.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03745390.9 / EP1490104 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030745390) is 03.05.2006 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2003 | AT | 19.09.2012 | BE | 19.09.2012 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | IT | 19.09.2012 | MC | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | ES | 30.12.2012 | PT | 21.01.2013 | IE | 01.04.2013 | LU | 01.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 01.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 01.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5728387 (BRILES DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract; claims; examples;; example -; claim - *; | [A] - LIFSHITZ S ET AL, "Age-dependent preference in human antibody responses to Streptococcus pneumoniae polypeptide antigens", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY,, (20020201), vol. 127, no. 2, pages 344 - 353, XP002617095 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2249.2002.01745.x | [A] - BRILES D E ET AL, "The potential for using protein vaccines to protect against otitis media caused by Streptococcus pneumoniae", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (20001208), vol. 19, ISSN 0264-410X, pages S87 - S95, XP004227955 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(00)00285-1 | [A] - JEDRZEJAS M J, "PNEUMOCOCCAL VIRULENCE FACTORS: STRUCTURE AND FUNCTION", MICROBIOLOGY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY REVIEWS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20010601), vol. 65, no. 2, doi:10.1128/MMBR.65.2.187-207.2001, ISSN 1092-2172, pages 187 - 207, XP001100692 [A] 1-15 * Page 188, left column, paragraphs 3- right column, paragraph 1; conclusions on page 203- 204; Figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MMBR.65.2.187-207.2001 | [A] - TETTELIN H ET AL, "Complete genome sequence of a virulent isolate of Streptococcus pneumoniae", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20010720), vol. 293, no. 5529, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1061217, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 498 - 506, XP002263816 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1061217 | [A] - WIZEMANN T M ET AL, "Use of a whole genome approach to identify vaccine molecules affording protection against Streptococcus pneumoniae infection", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, US, (20010301), vol. 69, no. 3, doi:10.1128/IAI.69.3.1593-1598.2001, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 1593 - 1598, XP002263818 [A] 1-15 * abstract; table 2; Page 1597, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.69.3.1593-1598.2001 | by applicant | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4800159 | US4965188 | - SHAPIRO E.D. ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1991), vol. 325, pages 1453 - 1460 | - AZHARI R; LEONG K W., "Complex coacervation of chondroitin sulfate and gelatin and its use for encapsulation and slow release of a model protein", PROC. SYMP. CONTROL. REL., (1991), vol. 18, page 617 | - BROWN KE; LEONG K; HUANG CH; DALAL R; GREEN GD; HAIMES HB; JIMENEZ PA; BATHON J., "Gelatin/chondroitin 6-sulfate microspheres for delivery of therapeutic proteins to the joint", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1998), vol. 41, pages 2185 - 2195 | - BROWN KE; LEONG K; HUANG CH; DALAL R; GREEN GD; HAIMES HB; JIMENEZ PA; BATHON J, "Gelatin/chondroitin 6-sulfate microspheres for delivery of therapeutic proteins to the joint", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1998), vol. 41, pages 2185 - 2195 | - PCR Protocols: A guide to method and applications | - RAPOLA S. ET AL., J. INFECT. DIS., (2000), vol. 182, pages 1146 - 52 |