Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012028335 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2012 | A3 | WO2012028335 | 08.03.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US34466810 | 08.09.2010 | EP10075383 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9458463 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2016 | B2 | US2015079108 | 19.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34466810 | 08.09.2010 | WO2011EP04567 | 05.09.2011 | EP10075383 | 03.09.2010 | US201313820226 | 01.03.2013 | US201414554714 | 26.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013336986 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34466810 | 08.09.2010 | WO2011EP04567 | 05.09.2011 | US201113820226 | 05.09.2011 | EP10075383 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015083575 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US34466810 | 08.09.2010 | EP10075383 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013536815 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US34466810 | 08.09.2010 | WO2011EP04567 | 05.09.2011 | EP10075383 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2677031 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2016 | B1 | EP2677031 | 25.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13185458 | 05.09.2011 | US34466810 | 08.09.2010 | EP10075383 | 03.09.2010 | EP11760402 | 05.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2611919 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US34466810 | 08.09.2010 | WO2011EP04567 | 05.09.2011 | EP10075383 | 03.09.2010 | EP11760402 | 05.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011297893B | Global Dossier | 31.03.2016 | B2 | AU2011297893 | 14.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34466810 | 08.09.2010 | WO2011EP04567 | 05.09.2011 | EP10075383 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2809194 | 08.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34466810 | 08.09.2010 | WO2011EP04567 | 05.09.2011 | EP10075383 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201301176 | 30.04.2014 | B | Priority number | Date | US34466810 | 08.09.2010 | WO2011EP04567 | 05.09.2011 | EP10075383 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2426202 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10075383 | 03.09.2010 |