EP2426202 - Kinases as targets for anti-diabetic therapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bäcker, Mathias Am Klopferspitz 18 82152 Martinsried / DE | 02 /
Ullrich, Axel Brunnstrasse 5 80331 Munich / DE | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent & Trademark Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent & Trademark Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 10075383.9 | 03.09.2010 | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2426202 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/00 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
C12N15/1137 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (US);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12Y207/11001 (EP,US);
C12Y207/11016 (EP,US);
C12Y207/1102 (EP,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kinasen als Targets für antidiabetische Therapien | [2012/10] | English: | Kinases as targets for anti-diabetic therapy | [2012/10] | French: | Kinases en tant que cibles pour thérapie antidiabétique | [2012/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/10] | 17.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02062818 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14* claims 1,20 *; | [A]WO2004022772 (ERNST MORITZ ARNDT UNI VERSITA [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 4-11; sequence 4 *; | [XA] - BILLEMONT B ET AL, "Blood glucose levels in patients with metastatic renal cell carcinoma treated with sunitinib.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER 4 NOV 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18841151, (20081104), vol. 99, no. 9, ISSN 1532-1827, pages 1380 - 1382, XP002621250 [X] 1-9,14 * the whole document * [A] 10-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjc.6604709 | by applicant | WO9729782 |