26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
04.05.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
26.05.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
24.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.05.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.01.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.01.2017 |
Change - German title |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
13.01.2017 |
Change - English title |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
13.01.2017 |
Change - French title |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
03.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] |
25.01.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.06.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] |