Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010180714 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20090015 | 20.01.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2208580 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2017 | B1 | EP2208580 | 21.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20090015 | 20.01.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN201833258U | 18.05.2011 | U | Priority number | Date | ITMI20090015 | 20.01.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITMI20090015U | 21.07.2010 | U1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20090015 | 20.01.2009 |