Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.12.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
15.02.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.10.2013 | Change - applicant | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
02.08.2013 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
20.03.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.02.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.07.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
08.07.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
21.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant |