Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
30.12.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
23.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |
02.12.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] |
14.01.2011 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |
17.12.2010 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
17.12.2010 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
03.11.2010 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.11.2010 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | |
01.10.2010 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
10.09.2010 | Change - classification | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] |
20.07.2010 | New entry: Fee payment for extension state | |
18.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant | |
07.05.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] |
07.05.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.05.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] |