EP2193716 - Fungicidal Compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tobler, Hans Birsigstrasse 129 4054, Basel / CH | 02 /
Walter, Harald Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG, Schaffhau 4332, Stein / CH | 03 /
Haas, Ulrich Johannes Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG, Schaffhau 4332, Stein / CH | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Hölscher, Ingo Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Intellectual Property Werk Stein Schaffhauserstrasse 4332 Stein / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Hölscher, Ingo Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Intellectual Property Werk Stein Schaffhauserstrasse CH-4332 Stein / CH | Application number, filing date | 10157578.5 | 23.04.2008 | [2010/23] | Priority number, date | EP20070008370 | 25.04.2007 Original published format: EP 07008370 | [2010/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2193716 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2193716 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/56 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
A01N43/56 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/40 (US);
A01N43/50 (US);
A01N43/54 (US);
A01N43/653 (US);
A01N43/84 (US);
| C-Set: |
A01N43/56, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/56, A01N37/34, A01N37/36, A01N43/36, A01N43/40, A01N43/54, A01N43/56, A01N43/653, A01N43/84 (EP,US);
A01N43/56, A01N37/38 (US);
A01N57/20, A01N43/56, A01N43/54 (US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/23] | Extension states | AL | 15.07.2010 | BA | 15.07.2010 | MK | 15.07.2010 | RS | 15.07.2010 | Title | German: | Fungizidzusammensetzungen | [2010/23] | English: | Fungicidal Compositions | [2010/23] | French: | Compositions fongicides | [2010/23] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 21.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08749078.5 / EP2150113 | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IS | 16.02.2011 | MT | 16.02.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/33] |
Former [2012/05] | MT | 16.02.2011 | |
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | MC | 30.04.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004035589 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO2006037632 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al); | [AP]WO2007048556 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) | by applicant | EP0353191 | EP0392225 | WO9533818 | WO2004035589 | WO2006037632 |