EP2233205 - Flavor extracting device for isolation or analysis of volatile compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symrise AG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Symrise GmbH & Co. KG Mühlenfeldstraße 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brennecke, Stefan Unter der Helle 7 37620, Halle / DE | 02 /
Degenhardt, Andreas Franz-Liszt-Weg 8 37603 Holzminden / DE | 03 /
Weber, Berthold Knulenweg 4a 37671, Höxter / DE | 04 /
Kohlenberg, Birgit Am Dreschplatz 1 37619, Pegestorf / DE | 05 /
Krammer, Gerhard Wagnerstraße 4 37603, Holzminden / DE | [2014/17] |
Former [2010/42] | 01 /
Brennecke, Stefan Unter der Helle 7 37620, Halle / DE | ||
02 /
Degenhardt, Andreas Frans-Liszt-Weg 8 37603, Holzminden / DE | |||
03 /
Weber, Berthold Knulenweg 4a 37671, Höxter / DE | |||
04 /
Kohlenberg, Birgit Am Dreschplatz 1 37619, Pegestorf / DE | |||
05 /
Krammer, Gerhard Wagnerstraße 4 37603, Holzminden / DE | |||
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
Brennecke, Stefan Unter der Helle 7 37620, Halle / DE | ||
02 /
Degenhardt, Andreas Schulstraße 1 37603, Holzminden / DE | |||
03 /
Weber, Berthold Knulenweg 4a 37671, Höxter / DE | |||
04 /
Kohlenberg, Birgit Am Dreschplatz 1 37619, Pegestorf / DE | |||
05 /
Krammer, Gerhard Wagnerstraße 4 37603, Holzminden / DE | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2014/19] |
Former [2010/52] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Am Kaffee-Quartier 3 28217 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2010/39] | Eisenführ, Günther Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10157627.0 | 24.03.2010 | [2010/39] | Priority number, date | EP20090156068 | 24.03.2009 Original published format: EP 09156068 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2233205 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2233205 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | [2011/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2233205 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/32, G01N1/40 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
B01J20/3276 (EP,US);
B01J20/328 (EP,US);
B01J2220/54 (EP,US);
G01N1/405 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | Geschmacksextraktionsvorrichtung zur Isolation oder Analyse flüchtiger Verbindungen | [2010/39] | English: | Flavor extracting device for isolation or analysis of volatile compounds | [2010/39] | French: | Dispositif d'extraction d'aromes pour l'isolation ou l'analyse de composants volatiles | [2013/31] |
Former [2010/39] | Dispositif d'extraction de saveur pour l'isolation ou l'analyse de composants volatiles | Examination procedure | 03.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 09.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2010 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | HR | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | MK | 07.05.2014 | MT | 07.05.2014 | NL | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | SM | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | NO | 07.08.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 24.03.2010 | |
AT | 07.05.2014 | ||
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
TR | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN101362075 (UNIV XIAMEN [CN]) [I] 1,4,8-12 * abstract *; | [I]US2001045000 (GUNDEL LARA A [US], et al) [I] 1-8,10,11,14 * page 7, paragraph 129 * * page 3, paragraph 58 * * page 5, paragraph 103 * * page 5, paragraph 101 * * page 6, paragraph 105 - paragraph 106 * * page 8, paragraph 132 - paragraph 133 * * page 8, paragraph 148 *; | [AD]WO9964480 (WATERS INVESTMENTS LTD [US], et al) [AD] 1,4,7,8,10-14 * the whole document * * page 10, line 2 * * page 10, line 33 - page 11, line 3 *; | [A]WO2005024389 (BUETTNER ANDREA [DE]) [A] 1,2,8-14 * page 14, line 12 - line 20 * * page 17, line 13 * * page 17, line 7 * * page 6, line 2 * * page 11, line 7 - line 8 * * page 22, line 14 - line 15 *; | [I] - HUANG X; QIU N; YUAN D; HUANG B, "A novel stir bar sorptive extraction coating based on monolithic material for apolar, polar organic compounds and heavy metal ions", TALANTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20081111), vol. 78, no. 1, ISSN 0039-9140, pages 101 - 106, XP025896515 [I] 1,4,8,10-12 * page 102, column r, line 18 - line 20 * * page 102, paragraph 2.1 * * page 102, column r, paragraph 2.3 * * page 103, paragraph 2.4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.talanta.2008.10.058 | [I] - KETOLA R A; KIURU J T; TARKIAINEN V; KOKKONEN J T; RASANEN J; KOTIAHO T, "Detection of volatile organic compounds by temperature-programmed desorption combined with mass spectrometry and Fourier transform infrared spectroscopy", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20060315), vol. 562, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2670, pages 245 - 251, XP025047172 [I] 1,2,4,8,10-12,14 * abstract * * page 248, column r, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.aca.2006.01.069 | [A] - CAMEL V; CAUDE M, "Trace enrichment methods for the determination of organic pollutants in ambient air", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950825), vol. 710, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 3 - 19, XP004038699 [A] 1-14 * page 10; table 2 * * page 6, paragraph 3.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9673(95)00080-7 | Examination | US2006247361 | by applicant | WO9115745 | EP1039288 | DE102004006856 | WO9964480 | US5976367 | - BALTUSSEN, E.; CRAMERS, C. A.; SANDRA, P. J. F., ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 373, no. 1-2, pages 3 - 22 | - MONTERO, L.; POPP, P.; PASCHKE, A.; PAWLISZYN, J., JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, A, (2004), vol. 1025, no. 1, pages 17 - 26 | - WANG, LILI; HOSAKA, AKIHIKO; WATANABE, CHUICHI; OHTANI, HAJIME; TSUGE, SHIN, JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (2004), vol. 1035, no. 2, pages 277 - 279 | - WANG, LILI; ZHANG, XIAO; WANG, YIPING; WANG, WEI, ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, (2006), vol. 577, no. 1, pages 62 - 67 | - J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2005), vol. 53, pages 9578 - 9585 | - FISCHER GMBH | - JOURNAL OF FOOD COMPOSITION AND ANALYSIS, (20090622), pages 606 - 612 |