Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] |
18.11.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.06.2013 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
07.06.2013 | First examination report | |
29.05.2013 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
11.05.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
09.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
05.04.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.11.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |