EP2383631 - Hand-held mobile device and method for operating the hand-held mobile device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB 221 88 Stockholm / SE | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henricson, Johan / Friisgatan 3a 214 21 Malmö / SE | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10161159.8 | 27.04.2010 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2383631 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/041 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
G06F3/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Tragbare mobile Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Betrieb der tragbaren mobilen Vorrichtung | [2011/44] | English: | Hand-held mobile device and method for operating the hand-held mobile device | [2011/44] | French: | Dispositif mobile portable et son procédé de fonctionnement | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 18.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008068348 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] , [ 0031] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0076]; figures 8a-8b * |