EP2258772 - Epoxy resin composition for semiconductor encapsulation and semiconductor device using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/49] | Epoxy Resin Composition for Semiconductor Encapsulation and Semiconductor Device Using the Same | ||
[2012/47] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akizuki, Shinya c/o Nitto Denko Corporation, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Ishizaka, Tsuyoshi c/o Nitto Denko Corporation, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | 03 /
Tabuchi, Yasuko c/o Nitto Denko Corporation, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | 04 /
Ichikawa, Tomoaki c/o Nitto Denko Corporation, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10164954.9 | 04.06.2010 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | JP20090134899 | 04.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009134899 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2258772 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/00 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
C08G59/245 (EP,US);
C08G59/5073 (EP,US);
C08G59/621 (EP,US);
C08G59/686 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
H01L23/293 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L2666/22 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Epoxyharzzusammensetzung für die Halbleiterverkapselung und Halbleitervorrichtung damit | [2010/49] | English: | Epoxy resin composition for semiconductor encapsulation and semiconductor device using the same | [2012/47] | French: | Composition de résine époxy pour encapsulation de semi-conducteur et dispositif semi-conducteur l'utilisant | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/49] | Epoxy Resin Composition for Semiconductor Encapsulation and Semiconductor Device Using the Same | Examination procedure | 17.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 15.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/39] | 10.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002077421 (SUMITA KAZUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0022]; claims 1,5 *; | [A]US2004034161 (OSADA SHOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0032] , [0056] , [0057] *; | [A]US2004254305 (HWANG KUEN-YUAN [TW], et al) [A] 1-7* paragraphs [0032] , [0045]; claim 7 * | by applicant | JPH11106476 |