Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.10.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |
17.06.2013 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
29.04.2013 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.03.2013 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | |
05.02.2013 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
17.07.2012 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
25.05.2012 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
11.04.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.01.2012 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
13.01.2012 | First examination report | |
06.01.2012 | Change - applicant | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] |
28.10.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
21.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant | |
08.04.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.03.2011 | Publication of search report | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
11.02.2011 | Change - classification | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] |
11.02.2011 | Change - classification | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] |
22.10.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
24.08.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |