EP2253687 - Calibration device and dye kit and utilisation thereof for characterising luminescence measuring systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAM Bundesanstalt für Materialforschung und -prüfung Unter den Eichen 87 12205 Berlin / DE | [2012/06] |
Former [2010/47] | For all designated states BAM Bundesanstalt für Materialforschung und -prüfung Unter den Eichen 87 12205 Berlin / DE | ||
For all designated states Sigma-Aldrich GmbH Industriestrasse 25 9470 Buchs / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Resch-Genger, Ute Memlingstr. 8a 12203, Berlin / DE | 02 /
Hoffmann, Katrin Schirnerstr. 13 12524, Berlin / DE | 03 /
Pfeifer, Dietmar Deulstraße 21 12459, Berlin / DE | 04 /
Nitschke, Roland Lindenstraße 10 79194, Gundelfingen / DE | 05 /
Nording, Pierre Wolfsacker 19 9473, Gams SG / CH | [2010/47] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10173097.6 | 15.03.2006 | [2010/47] | Priority number, date | DE20051013228 | 18.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005013228 | DE20051049365 | 11.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005049365 | [2010/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2253687 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2253687 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/27, G01N21/64, C09K11/06 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
G01N21/6458 (EP,US);
B01L3/5027 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
G01N21/278 (EP,US);
B01L2200/148 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0654 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L3/5025 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1011 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1033 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1088 (EP,US);
Y10T436/109163 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/47] | C09K11/06, // G01N21/64, G01N21/27 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | Kalibriereinrichtung und Farbstoffkit sowie ihre Verwendungen zur Charakterisierung von Lumineszenzmesssystemen | [2010/47] | English: | Calibration device and dye kit and utilisation thereof for characterising luminescence measuring systems | [2010/47] | French: | Dispositif de calibrage et ensemble de colorants, tout comme son utilisation destinée à la caractérisation de systèmes luminescents | [2010/47] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.06.2013 | 06.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/46] | 28.06.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06111148.0 / EP1703271 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060111148) is 02.04.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19847370 (LANGHALS HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, lines 12-15 * * page 4, lines 28-52 *; | [A]DE10200865 (CLONDIAG CHIP TECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0018] - [0033] - [0039] * * claims 1,4,5 *; | [AD]US6635487 (LEE ERNEST C W [US], et al) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * * column 6, lines 12-15,34-39 *; | [A]DE20216998U (EVOTEC AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * claims 5-9 *; | [E]EP1635164 (BAM BUNDESANSTALT MATFORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [E] 1-9 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0048] * * claims 1,24,26,49 *; | [X] - COURTOIS V., "Electroreductive Coupling of Organic Halides in Alcoholic Solvents. An Example: The Electrosynthesis of Biaryls Catalysed by Nickel-2,2' Bipyridine Complexes.", TETRAHEDRON, Amsterdam, (19970825), vol. 53, no. 34, doi:10.1016/S0040-4020(97)00744-8, pages 11569 - 11576, XP002620227 [X] 1-5 * page 11570, paragraph 2 * * page 11571 * * page 11575 * * tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(97)00744-8 | [X] - GIANLUCA AMBROSI, "Molecular switch triggered by solvent polarity", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, Weinheim, (20030129), vol. 9, no. 3, doi:10.1002/chem.200390090, pages 800 - 810, XP002620228 [X] 1-3 * Scheme 1, compound 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/CHEM.200390090 | [X] - KENTARO TAKAGI, "SYNTHESIS OF BIARYLS FROM ARYL IODIDES AND ZINC POWDER BY MEANS OF NICKEL CATALYST", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, Japan, (19790805), vol. 8, doi:10.1246/cl.1979.917, pages 917 - 918, XP002620229 [X] 1-3 * claim 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/cl.1979.917 | [A] - RANCE A. VELAPOLDI, "Corrected Emission Spectra and Quantum Yields for a Series of Fluorescent Compounds in the Visible Spectral Region", JOURNAL OF FLUORESCENCE, Amsterdam, (20040704), vol. 14, no. 4, doi:10.1023/B:JOFL.0000031828.96368.c1, pages 465 - 472, XP002620230 [A] 1-9 * page 465, column r - page 466, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:JOFL.0000031828.96368.c1 | Examination | - DU H ET AL, "PHOTOCHEMCAD: A COMPUTER-AIDED DESIGN AND RESEARCH TOOL IN PHOTOCHEMISTRY", PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, INC, US, (19980101), vol. 68, no. 2, doi:10.1562/0031-8655(1998)068<0141:PACADA>2.3.CO;2, ISSN 0031-8655, page 141/142, XP001090879 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1562/0031-8655(1998)068<0141:PACADA>2.3.CO;2 | - COLVIN V L ET AL, "LIGHT-EMITTING DIODES MADE FROM CADMIUM SELENIDE NANOCRYSTALS AND ASEMICONDUCTING POLYMER", NATURE: INTERNATIONAL WEEKLY JOURNAL OF SCIENCE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, UNITED KINGDOM, (19940804), vol. 370, no. 6488, doi:10.1038/370354A0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 354 - 357, XP000466647 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/370354a0 | - MITSUNOBU NAKAMURA ET AL, "Photolysis of bis(methoxyphenyl) methylphophonates", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, A: CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 85, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/1010-6030(94)03894-Z, ISSN 1010-6030, (19950104), pages 111 - 118, (20000420), XP002620852 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1010-6030(94)03894-Z | by applicant | WO02097878 | US2003030797 | US6635487 | - U. RESCH-GENGER ET AL., J. FLUORESC., (2005), vol. 15, no. 3, page 315FF | - U. RESCH-GENGER ET AL., J. FLUORESC., (2005), vol. 15, no. 3, page 337FF | - A. THOMMPSON; K. L. ECKERLE, SPIE, (1989), vol. 1054, page 20 | - J.W. HOFSTRAAT; M.J. LATUHIHIN, APPL. SPECTROSC., (1994), vol. 48, page 436 |