EP2302169 - Rotary machine tip clearance control mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Subramaniyan, Moorthi Flat Number 402, Bhuvana Grandeur 657, C-Block, AECS Layout Kundalahalli 560037, Bangalore / IN | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2011/13] | Gray, Thomas GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10178098.9 | 21.09.2010 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | US20090565108 | 23.09.2009 Original published format: US 565108 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2302169 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/20, F01D11/08 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
F01D11/08 (EP,US);
F01D5/225 (EP,US);
F05D2220/30 (EP,US);
F05D2240/80 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4932 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einstellung des Laufspaltes eines Rotors | [2011/13] | English: | Rotary machine tip clearance control mechanism | [2011/13] | French: | Contrôle de jeu des extrémités des aubes d'un rotor | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 05.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |