EP2314213 - Gui an implantable restriction device and a data logger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2011/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dlugos, Daniel F. 8072 Lois Lane Middletown, OH 45044 / US | 02 /
Brockmeier, Peter 35 Erie Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45246 / US | 03 /
Berger, Matthew A. 5808 Ropes Drive Cincinnati, OH 45244 / US | 04 /
Byrum, Randal T. 370 Forest Edge Drive South Lebanon, OH 45065 / US | 05 /
Doll, Kevin R. 6110 Glen View Mason, OH 45040 / US | 06 /
Gayoso, Gaspar M. 3161 Niles Street Cincinnati, OH 45208 / US | 07 /
Jensen, Dustin R. 955 Palomar Drive Loveland, OH 45140 / US | 08 /
Krumanaker, David T. 9573 Lansford Drive Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 09 /
Marcotte, Amy L. 5378 Harbourwatch Way Unit 104 Mason, OH 45040 / US | 10 /
Ortiz, Mark S. 1145 Glen Echo Lane Milford, OH 45150 / US | 11 /
Plescia, David N. 7245 Mariemont Crescent Cincinnati, OH 45227 / US | 12 /
Yates, David C. 7534 Galway Court West Chester, OH 45069 / US | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10179035.0 | 02.03.2009 | [2011/17] | Priority number, date | US20080039002 | 28.02.2008 Original published format: US 39002 | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2314213 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2314213 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/03, A61F5/00, // G06F3/048 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
A61B5/002 (EP,US);
A61B5/0022 (EP,US);
A61B5/02055 (EP,US);
A61B5/03 (EP,US);
A61B5/076 (EP,US);
A61B5/4205 (EP,US);
A61F5/0003 (EP,US);
A61F5/0056 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP);
A61B17/12009 (EP,US);
A61B17/1355 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00557 (EP,US);
A61B2090/064 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0219 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0252 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0257 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0261 (EP,US);
A61B2560/045 (EP,US);
A61B5/021 (EP,US);
A61B5/024 (EP,US);
A61B5/11 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/318 (EP);
A61F2250/0002 (EP,US);
A61M39/0208 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | Graphische Benutzerschnittstelle für eine implantierbare Einschränkungsvorrichtung und Messwerterfasser | [2011/17] | English: | Gui an implantable restriction device and a data logger | [2011/17] | French: | IUG pour un dispositif de restriction implantable et dispositif de journalisation de données | [2011/17] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/18] | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09250600.5 / EP2095766 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090250600) is 11.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1704833 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1-4,7* abstract *; | [X]WO2007070906 (LECHNER WOLFGANG [AT]) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * * page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 13, paragraph 2 * * page 14, paragraph 3 - page 15, paragraph 1 *; | [E]WO2010083498 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US], et al) [E] 1-4,7 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6067991 | US6461292 | US6470892 | US2003105385 | US2003114729 | US2006189888 | US2006211914 | US2006211912 | US2006211913 | US20070682459 |