EP2295018 - Patient support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville IN 47006 / US | [2012/47] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 530 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osborne, Eugene E 658 Sulky Court Hebron, KY 41048 / US | 02 /
Suttman, Glenn C 27033 Suttman Road Batesville, IN 47006 / US | 03 /
Visca, Matthew 4412 Whitmore Lane Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | 04 /
Welling, Jeffrey R 129 Ashley Hill Drive Goose Creek, SC 29445 / US | 05 /
Findlay, James K 7497 Timberlane Drive Fishers, IN 46038 / US | 06 /
Wilker, Jack B, Jr. 1418 Aaron Drive Shelbyville, IN 46176 / US | [2015/29] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
Osborne, Eugene E 658 Sulky Court Hebron, KY 41048 / US | ||
02 /
Suttman, Glenn C 27033 Suttman Road Batesville, IN 47006 / US | |||
03 /
Visca, Matthew 4412 Whitmore Lane Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | |||
04 /
Welling, Jeffrey R 129 Ashley Hill Drive Goose Creek, SC 29445 / US | |||
05 /
Findlay, James K 7497 Timberlane Drive Fishers, IN 46038 / US | |||
06 /
Wilker, Jack B, Jr. 1418 Aaron Drive Shelbyville, IN 46176 / US | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2011/11] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10179902.1 | 29.12.2000 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | US19990173428P | 29.12.1999 Original published format: US 173428 P | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2295018 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2295018 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2295018 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/00, A47C21/08 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
A61G7/015 (EP,US);
A47C19/045 (EP,US);
A61B5/1115 (EP,US);
A61G7/00 (EP,US);
A61G7/002 (EP,US);
A61G7/005 (EP,US);
A61G7/012 (EP,US);
A61G7/018 (EP,US);
A61G7/05 (EP,US);
A61G7/0507 (EP,US);
A61G7/0509 (EP,US);
A61G7/051 (EP,US);
A61G7/0513 (EP,US);
A61G7/0514 (EP,US);
A61G7/052 (EP,US);
A61G7/0524 (EP,US);
A61G7/0527 (EP,US);
A61G7/0528 (EP,US);
A61G7/053 (EP,US);
A61G7/05715 (EP,US);
A61G7/05769 (EP,US);
A61G7/0755 (EP,US);
G01G19/445 (EP,US);
A61B5/6891 (EP,US);
A61G2203/12 (EP,US);
A61G2203/16 (EP,US);
A61G2203/20 (EP,US);
A61G2203/34 (EP,US);
A61G2203/36 (EP,US);
A61G2203/40 (EP,US);
A61G2203/44 (EP,US);
A61G2203/726 (EP,US);
A61G2203/74 (EP,US);
A61G7/001 (EP,US);
A61G7/008 (EP,US);
A61G7/0506 (EP,US);
A61G7/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/29] |
Former [2011/11] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Patientenliege | [2011/11] | English: | Patient support | [2011/11] | French: | Support pour patient | [2011/11] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 16.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 23.01.2015 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 04.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2015 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 04.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00990419.4 / EP1242030 | EP06077064.1 / EP1754462 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000990419) is 17.01.2005 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   11.05.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0657155 (LE COUVIOUR SA [FR]) [X] 1,2* figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0657155 |