Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
07.07.2017 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
30.06.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.06.2017 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
21.06.2017 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
21.06.2017 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
22.02.2017 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
06.04.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.06.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.03.2015 | Change - applicant | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] |
07.03.2015 | Change - representative | |
04.07.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.08.2013 | Change - applicant | published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
04.07.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.04.2013 | Change - representative | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
04.07.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.07.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
29.06.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.11.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] |
06.10.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |