Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011195669 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6937502 | 25.02.2002 | JP2000204222 | 05.07.2000 | US4972805 | 04.02.2005 | US49567309 | 30.06.2009 | JP0105395 | 25.06.2001 | US201113090821 | 20.04.2011 | JP2000232268 | 26.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7953029 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2011 | B2 | US2009270043 | 29.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6937502 | 25.02.2002 | JP2000204222 | 05.07.2000 | US4972805 | 04.02.2005 | US49567309 | 30.06.2009 | JP2000232268 | 26.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7573838 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2009 | B2 | US2005135282 | 23.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6937502 | 25.02.2002 | JP2000204222 | 05.07.2000 | US4972805 | 04.02.2005 | JP2000232268 | 26.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3719956B | Global Dossier | 24.11.2005 | B2 | JP2002084577 | 22.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000204222 | 05.07.2000 | JP2000232268 | 26.06.2000 | JP2001193277 | 26.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1204292 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2011 | B1 | EP1204292 | 11.07.2007 | A4 | EP1204292 | 08.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000204222 | 05.07.2000 | JP0105395 | 25.06.2001 | JP2000232268 | 26.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7460501 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000204222 | 05.07.2000 | JP0105395 | 25.06.2001 | JP2000232268 | 26.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2265075 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2017 | B1 | EP2265075 | 22.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000204222 | 05.07.2000 | JP2000232268 | 26.06.2000 | EP01941208 | 25.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6889041 | 03.05.2005 | B2 | US2002137519 | 26.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000204222 | 05.07.2000 | JP0105395 | 25.06.2001 | JP2000232268 | 26.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0201908 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000204222 | 05.07.2000 | JP2000232268 | 26.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100467386B | Global Dossier | 24.01.2005 | B1 | KR20020026600 | 10.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000204222 | 05.07.2000 | JP2000232268 | 26.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100353809C | 05.12.2007 | C | CN1627857 | 15.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000204222 | 05.07.2000 | JP2000232268 | 26.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1185902C | 19.01.2005 | C | CN1383698 | 04.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000204222 | 05.07.2000 | JP2000232268 | 26.06.2000 | Type | Earlier application | EP1204292 |