EP2265075 - Mobile communication system wherein data transmission rate values are reported from the mobile station to the base station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2015/17] |
Former [2013/38] | For all designated states Harris Corporation 1025 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne, FL 32919 / US | ||
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyoshi, Kenichi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Hiramatsu, Katsuhiko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Aoyama, Takahisa c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Sumasu, Atsushi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
Kato, Osamu c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/32] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
Miyoshi, Kenichi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
Hiramatsu, Katsuhiko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
Aoyama, Takahisa c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
04 /
Sumasu, Atsushi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
05 /
Kato, Osamu c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/32] |
Former [2013/21] | Röthinger, Rainer, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10181258.4 | 25.06.2001 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | JP20000232268 | 26.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000232268 | JP20000204222 | 05.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000204222 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2265075 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2265075 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
H04W28/22 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/0229 (EP,US);
H04W52/0245 (EP,US);
H04W52/0258 (EP,US);
H04W72/21 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04W52/24 (EP,US);
H04W52/26 (EP,US);
H04W72/12 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/32] |
Former [2010/51] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Mobile Kommunikationssystem wobei Datenübertragungsratewerte werden von der Mobilstation zur Basisstation gemeldet | [2010/51] | English: | Mobile communication system wherein data transmission rate values are reported from the mobile station to the base station | [2010/51] | French: | Système de communication mobile dans lequel les valeurs sur le taux de transmission de données sont rapportés par la station mobile à la station de base | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 23.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01941208.9 / EP1204292 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010941208) is 12.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9923844 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [I]WO9943178 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [A]GB2339994 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) |