12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
12.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |
11.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
07.02.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
15.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
01.03.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
15.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.12.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.10.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
06.01.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] |
26.10.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.05.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |