EP2302023 - Synergistic organoborate compositions and lubricating compositions containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vanderbilt Chemicals, LLC 30 Winfield Street Norwalk, CT 06855 / US | [2013/16] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC. 30 Winfield Street Norwalk Connecticut 06856-5150 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karol, Thomas J. 76-5917 H Mamalahoa Hwy. Halualoa-Kona, HI 96725 / US | 02 /
Donnelly, Steven G. 22 Linda Lane Besthel, CT 06801 / US | [2013/16] |
Former [2011/18] | 01 /
Karol, Thomas J. 76-5917 H Mamalahoa Hwy. Halualoa-Kona, HI 96725 / US | ||
02 /
Donnelly, Steven G. 22 Linda Lane Besthel, CT 06801 / US | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2011/13] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 10195247.1 | 02.10.2003 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | US20020416061P | 04.10.2002 Original published format: US 416061 P | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2302023 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2302023 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2302023 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C10M141/12, C10M159/18, // C10N10/04, C10N10/06, C10N10/10, C10N10/12, C10N10/16, C10N30/06 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
C10M159/18 (EP,US);
C10M141/12 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1065 (EP,US);
C10M2207/022 (EP,US);
C10M2207/125 (EP,US);
C10M2207/126 (EP,US);
C10M2207/127 (EP,US);
C10M2207/129 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,US);
C10M2219/066 (EP,US);
C10M2219/068 (EP,US);
C10M2219/106 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10M2223/047 (EP,US);
C10M2227/061 (EP,US);
C10M2227/062 (EP,US);
C10M2227/09 (EP,US);
C10N2010/02 (EP,US);
C10N2010/04 (EP,US);
C10N2010/06 (EP,US);
C10N2010/08 (EP,US);
C10N2010/10 (EP,US);
C10N2010/12 (EP,US);
C10N2010/14 (EP,US);
C10N2010/16 (EP,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/42 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M2207/022, C10M2207/125, C10N2010/12 (US,EP);
C10M2207/022, C10M2207/126, C10N2010/12 (US,EP);
C10M2207/022, C10M2207/127, C10N2010/12 (US,EP);
C10M2207/022, C10M2207/129, C10N2010/12 (US,EP);
C10M2207/125, C10M2207/022, C10N2010/12 (US,EP);
C10M2207/125, C10M2215/042, C10N2010/12 (US,EP);
C10M2207/126, C10M2207/022, C10N2010/12 (US,EP);
C10M2207/126, C10M2215/042, C10N2010/12 (US,EP);
C10M2207/127, C10M2207/022, C10N2010/12 (EP,US);
C10M2207/127, C10M2215/042, C10N2010/12 (US,EP);
C10M2207/129, C10M2207/022, C10N2010/12 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042, C10M2207/125, C10N2010/12 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042, C10M2207/126, C10N2010/12 (US,EP);
C10M2215/042, C10M2207/127, C10N2010/12 (US,EP) (-) |
Former IPC [2011/13] | C10M141/12, C10M159/18, C10N10/04, C10N10/06, C10N10/10, C10N10/12, C10N10/16, C10N30/06, // C10N10/04, C10N10/06, C10N10/10, C10N10/12, C10N10/16, C10N30/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | Synergistische Organoboratzusammensetzungen und Schmierzusammensetzungen damit | [2011/13] | English: | Synergistic organoborate compositions and lubricating compositions containing same | [2011/13] | French: | Compositions d'organoborate synergiques et compositions lubrifiantes contenant lesdites compositions d'organoborate synergiques | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 17.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03774614.6 / EP1573839 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030774614) is 16.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | CZ | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | RO | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | SI | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | IE | 02.10.2013 | LU | 02.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
IE | 02.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
IE | 02.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 19.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2975134 (COOK JAMES F) [A] 1-8* column 1, lines 1-31 *; | [I]EP0393748 (MINI COOPRICERA SCIENTIF TECH [IT]) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US5629272 (NAKAZATO MORIKUNI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-7 * claims 1,6,7 * * example 3; table 1 *; | [XD]US5641731 (BAUMGART RICHARD JOSEPH [US], et al) [XD] 1 * abstract * * column 6, lines 43-56 * * claim 1 *; | [X]WO02062930 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2444328 | US2492314 | US3087936 | US3200107 | US3211652 | US3219666 | US3254025 | US3275554 | US3282955 | US3316177 | US3329658 | US3340281 | US3351552 | US3367943 | US3381022 | USRE26433E | US3433744 | US3438757 | US3442808 | US3444170 | US3449250 | US3454555 | US3455832 | US3467668 | US3501405 | US3513093 | US3519656 | US3542680 | US3565804 | US3567638 | US3576743 | US3579450 | US3600372 | US3632511 | US3639242 | US3649659 | US3666730 | US3687849 | US3702300 | US3702757 | US3708422 | GB1306529 | US4029587 | US4031023 | US4130494 | US4215067 | US4234435 | US4389322 | US4466894 | US4648985 | US4753745 | US4758362 | US4761842 | US4792410 | US4857214 | US4880553 | US4880437 | US4889647 | US5110488 | US5157088 | US5198133 | US5230714 | US5256752 | US5328619 | US5354484 | US5395539 | US5403501 | US5641731 | US2003119682 |