|
29.05.2017 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.08.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2013 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |