Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2343961
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
02.06.2017 |
Refusal of application |
published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] |
16.02.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
16.02.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
14.02.2017 |
Change: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
22.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2016 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
21.12.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.02.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.10.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.07.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.03.2014 |
First examination report |
|
19.03.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.02.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
08.02.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2013 |
Publication of search report |
published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
05.07.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
21.06.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |
12.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |