EP2343961 - Ground switching component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [2011/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sariarslan, Kursat Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bolgesi 45030, Manisa / TR | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | Cayli, Hülya Paragon Consultancy Inc. Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP 06540 Ankara / TR | [2011/28] | Application number, filing date | 10196194.4 | 21.12.2010 | [2011/28] | Priority number, date | TR20100000142 | 08.01.2010 Original published format: TR 201000142 | [2011/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2343961 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2343961 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
H05K9/0039 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Erdschaltungskomponente | [2011/28] | English: | Ground switching component | [2011/28] | French: | Composant de commutation de mise à la terre | [2011/28] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 20.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 24.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/27] | 17.02.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008143614 (PARK JONG-KUI [KR], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0040] *; | [I]US5231308 (FISCH ALFONS [DE]) [I] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2000196289 | JP2000180488 |