|
28.06.2023 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2023 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.07.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
24.07.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
05.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2018 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.05.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2011 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |