Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101329863B | Global Dossier | 14.11.2013 | B1 | KR20120001791 | 04.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US25155 | 24.02.2010 | US41537309 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5600733B | Global Dossier | 01.10.2014 | B2 | JP2012522104 | 20.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US25155 | 24.02.2010 | US41537309 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102378807B | Global Dossier | 10.12.2014 | B | CN102378807 | 14.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US25155 | 24.02.2010 | US41537309 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2414490 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2020 | B1 | EP2414490 | 08.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US25155 | 24.02.2010 | US41537309 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI1006423 | 15.05.2018 | B8 | BRPI1006423 | 17.04.2018 | B1 | BRPI1006423 | 10.02.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US25155 | 24.02.2010 | US41537309 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010117509 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US41537309 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8118995 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2012 | B2 | US2010243537 | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US41537309 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR075957 | 11.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US41537309 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY156752 | 31.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US41537309 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI488956B | 21.06.2015 | B | TW201038726 | 01.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US41537309 | 31.03.2009 |