Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2411864
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.09.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
14.05.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.05.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.11.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.10.2016 |
Change - inventor |
|
07.10.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
07.10.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
07.10.2016 |
Change - French title |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
14.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
08.05.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.12.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
30.12.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
13.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|