Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012013831 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09004886 | 02.04.2009 | EP09004332 | 26.03.2009 | WO2010EP01500 | 11.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012521571 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09004886 | 02.04.2009 | EP09004332 | 26.03.2009 | WO2010EP01500 | 11.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102326120 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09004886 | 02.04.2009 | EP09004332 | 26.03.2009 | WO2010EP01500 | 11.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2411864 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09004886 | 02.04.2009 | EP10709414 | 11.03.2010 | EP09004332 | 26.03.2009 | WO2010EP01500 | 11.03.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010108593 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09004886 | 02.04.2009 | EP09004332 | 26.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110132616 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09004886 | 02.04.2009 | EP09004332 | 26.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI493262B | 21.07.2015 | B | TW201039026 | 01.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09004886 | 02.04.2009 | EP09004332 | 26.03.2009 |