EP2411864 - PROCESS OF PREPARING AN ANISOTROPIC MULTILAYER USING PARTICLE BEAM ALIGNMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARRI, Owain, Llyr Ibis House 215A Christchurch Road Ringwood Hampshire BH24 3AN / GB | 02 /
YAROSHCHUK, Oleg Ozerna Street 9 Apt. 62 Kyiv 03110 / UA | 03 /
KRAVCHUK, Ruslan Kustanayska St., 11 Apt.15 03118 Kiew / UA | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | 01 /
PARRI, Owain, Llyr Ibis House 215A Christchurch Road Ringwood Hampshire BH24 3AN / GB | ||
02 /
YAROSHCHUK, Oleg Ozerna Street 9 Apt. 62 Kyiv 03110 / UA | |||
03 /
KRAVCHUK, Ruslan Kustanayska St., 11 Apt.15 03118 Kiew / UA | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/05] | Application number, filing date | 10709414.6 | 11.03.2010 | WO2010EP01500 | Priority number, date | EP20090004332 | 26.03.2009 Original published format: EP 09004332 | EP20090004886 | 02.04.2009 Original published format: EP 09004886 | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010108593 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2411864 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, G02F1/1337 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
G02B5/3016 (EP,US);
G02F1/1337 (KR);
B32B37/00 (KR);
G02F1/13363 (KR);
G02F1/13378 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2305/55 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/05] | G02F1/1337, G02F1/13363, B32B37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ANISOTROPEN MEHRFACHSCHICHT DURCH PARTIKELSTRAHLAUSRICHTUNG | [2012/05] | English: | PROCESS OF PREPARING AN ANISOTROPIC MULTILAYER USING PARTICLE BEAM ALIGNMENT | [2012/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT MULTI COUCHES ANISOTROPIQUE A L'AIDE D'UN FAISCEAU À PARTICULES | [2016/45] |
Former [2012/05] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE MULTICOUCHE ANISOTROPE À L'AIDE D'UN ALIGNEMENT DE FAISCEAU DE PARTICULES | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 30.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 15.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO2008028553 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,7-9,11-14 * page 39, lines 8-11 * * page 40, lines 4-11 * * figure 3 * [I] 3,5,6,10 | by applicant | US7169447 | WO2008028553 | WO2004104862 | US4153529 | WO2004104682 | WO9322397 | EP0261712 | DE19504224 | WO9522586 | WO9700600 | US5518652 | US5750051 | US5770107 | US6514578 | - SCHADT ET AL., SID'99 | - M.SCHADT ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE SID, (2003), vol. 11/3, page 519 | - JPN. J. APPL. PHYS., (1995), vol. 34, pages L764 - 767 | - O. YAROSHCHUK; R. KRAVCHUK; O. PARRI ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE SID, (2008), vol. 16/9, pages 905 - 909 | - O. YAROSHCHUK; R. KRAVCHUK; O. PARRI ET AL., SID DIGEST, (2007), pages 694 - 697 | - KAUFMAN, R. ROBINSON, PLASMA SOURCES SCI. TECHNOL., (1999), vol. 8, page 1 | - C. TSCHIERSKE; G. PELZL; S. DIELE, ANGEW. CHEM., (2004), vol. 116, pages 6340 - 6368 | - P. CHAUDHARI; J. LACEY; S. A. LIEN; J. SPEIDELL, JPN J APPL PHYS, (1998), vol. 37, no. 1-2, pages L55 - L56 | - P.CHAUDHARI ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 56 - 59 | - O. YAROSHCHUK ET AL., LIQ. CRYST., (2004), vol. 31, no. 6, pages 859 - 869 | - J. STOEHR ET AL., SCIENCE | - P. CHAUDHARI ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, page 56 | - O. YAROSHCHUK ET AL., LIQ.CRYST., (2004), vol. 31, no. 6, pages 859 - 869 |