EP2401256 - Compounds as bradykinin B1 antagonists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/01] | COMPOUNDS AS BRADYKININ B1 ANTAGONISTS | ||
[2012/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUEL, Norbert Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 02 /
CECI, Angelo Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 03 /
DOODS, Henri Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 04 /
KONETZKI, Ingo Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 05 /
MACK, Juergen Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 06 /
PRIEPKE, Henning Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 07 /
SCHULER-METZ, Annette Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 08 /
WALTER, Rainer Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 09 /
WIEDENMAYER, Dieter Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2012/40] |
Former [2012/01] | Hammann, Heinz Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 10711628.7 | 23.02.2010 | WO2010EP52232 | Priority number, date | EP20090153778 | 26.02.2009 Original published format: EP 09153778 | [2012/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010097372 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2401256 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2401256 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/62, C07D213/81, C07D233/90, C07D239/28, C07D261/18, C07D271/10, C07D239/557, C07D207/277, C07D237/24, A61K31/165, A61K31/44, A61K31/505, A61K31/506, C07D401/12, C07D405/12 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D239/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P11/14 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07C237/24 (EP,US);
C07D207/277 (EP,US);
C07D211/62 (EP,US);
C07D213/81 (EP,US);
C07D233/90 (EP,US);
C07D239/557 (EP,KR,US);
C07D261/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | BA | 26.09.2011 | RS | 26.09.2011 | Title | German: | Verbindungen als Bradykinin-B1-Antagonisten | [2012/36] | English: | Compounds as bradykinin B1 antagonists | [2012/36] | French: | Composés comme antagonistes de la bradykinine B1 | [2012/36] |
Former [2012/01] | VERBINDUNGEN ALS BRADYKININ-B1-ANTAGONISTEN | ||
Former [2012/01] | COMPOUNDS AS BRADYKININ B1 ANTAGONISTS | ||
Former [2012/01] | COMPOSÉS UTILISÉS COMME ANTAGONISTES DE LA BRADYKININE B1 | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 06.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 17.04.2013 | [2016/22] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03066577 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1,29-34 * claims 1,36-40; tables 1-10 *; | [A]WO2004019868 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1,29-34 * claims 1,27-29; tables 1-6 *; | [A]WO2005016886 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1,29-34* examples 1-24; claims 1-13 *; | [A]WO2005085198 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1,29-34 * claims 1-10; table 1 * | by applicant | WO2006120176 | - Houben-Weyl, Methoden der Organischen Chemie, vol. 15/2 |