Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8803658 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2014 | B2 | US2012119875 | 17.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009031385 | 01.07.2009 | WO2010EP59274 | 30.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2449509 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2014 | B1 | EP2449509 | 09.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009031385 | 01.07.2009 | WO2010EP59274 | 30.06.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011000864 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009031385 | 01.07.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009031385 | 05.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009031385 | 01.07.2009 |